HEMPSTEAD WITH ECCLES AND LESSINGHAM COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 244247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes Relief of Poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £624
Total expenditure: £400

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 August 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HEMPSTEAD ECCLES AND LESSINGHAM TRUSTEES FOR THE POOR (Working name)
  • POOR'S ALLOTMENT KNOWN AS FUEL ALLOTMENT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KENNETH MARTIN WHITE Chair
None on record
Margaret Helen Henderson Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Moore Trustee 17 July 2022
None on record
Malcolm Moore Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
Colin Robin Deacon Trustee 07 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £624 £624 £624 £624 £624
Total expenditure £0 £700 £700 £500 £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 13 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 17 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 11 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 14 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Moat Farm Cottages
East Ruston Road
Lessingham
NORWICH
NR12 0DW
Phone:
01692 581857
Website:

No information available