BETHANY HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Registered Social Landlord providing housing to elderly and infirm people of Christian Character
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 08 February 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethany Home Trustee Ltd | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.42k | £45.98k | £46.09k | £45.89k | £42.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.66k | £35.18k | £49.86k | £45.08k | £36.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 AUG 1965 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
TO FOUND PROVIDE BUILD RUN AND MAINTAIN HOMES HOUSES HOSTELS OR ACCOMMODATION FOR THE RESIDENCE AND USE BY AND THE CARE OF OLD AND INFIRM.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL (SOUTH AREA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
The stables
Hortham Farm
Hortham Lane
Almondsbury
Bristol
BS32 4JW
- Phone:
- 01454 612735
- Email:
- admin@southwestrelo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window