Trustees NUNEATON BEDWORTH AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY
Charity number: 244346

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Stott | Chair | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Boucher | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Mistry | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Seema Rishi | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE LOUISE TOMKINSON | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Sugrue | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Brookes | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Lees | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Moore | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Powis | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN GEORGE | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
STELLA GLADYS TOMKINSON MBE | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BAUGHAN | Trustee | 09 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA MEASURES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.