BRISTOL CIVIC SOCIETY INCORPORATING THE BRISTOL KYRLE SOCIETY (ESTABLISHED 1905)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bristol Civic Society: an independent force for a better Bristol. Our vision is for a city full of activity, diversity and beauty, attractive for living in, work and leisure. A place its citizens are proud of, and a place that people want to visit, especially through its buildings, facilities and public spaces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 03 November 1965: Standard registration
- BRISTOL CIVIC SOCIETY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Rosa Fryer | Chair | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY NORMAN HASLAM | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM EGARR | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA JAMES NESFIELD | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GAIL ELLIS | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN BATES | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR ALEX DUNN | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DANIEL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN GLYNNE WICKHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN BRADLEY MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.43k | £14.05k | £15.70k | £16.98k | £17.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.76k | £9.80k | £9.02k | £6.64k | £13.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH APRIL 1965 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY, CHARACTER AND FUTURE OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF BRISTOL AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS (B) TO ENCOURAGE (I) HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN BRISTOL AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS (II) THE PRESERVATION OF THE BEST OF THE REMAINING FEATURES OF THE HISTORIC PAST OF BRISTOL AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS AS WELL AS THE BEST OF THE EXISTING FEATURES OF PUBLIC AMENITY AND INTEREST (III) THE INCORPORATION AND BLENDING OF SUCH FEATURES IN PRESENT AND FUTURE DEVELOPEMENTS (IV) THE IMPROVEMENT OF EXISTING AND THE CREATION OF NEW FEATURES OF PUBLIC AMENITY AND INTEREST. (C) TO PURSUE THESE ENDS BY MEANS OF MEETINGS, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, PUBLICATION, OTHER FORMS OF INSTRUCTION AND SCHEMES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 ROWNHAM MEAD
BRISTOL
BS8 4YB
- Phone:
- 01179073588
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window