THE HOLLY TREE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings. Trips to theatre and other cultural places, social trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 November 1965: Standard registration
- 08 August 2022: Funds received from 1095834 THE WINDMILL THURSDAY CLUB LTD
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID OWEN ROGERS | Chair | 02 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Thomas Christopher Stringwell | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Quintin David Coetzer | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Philip Snashall | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Snashall | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Margaret Cork | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Stella May O'Neill | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEDDINGTON PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.27k | £95.15k | £89.84k | £14.70k | £14.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.70k | £80.50k | £61.99k | £20.75k | £15.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £85.30k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH MARCH 1964 AS AMENDED ON 21ST JULY 1971 AND 22 JUNE 1994 as amended on 08 Jun 2020 as amended on 24 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED, PHYSICALLY DISABLED, IN ANY MANNER WHICH MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE PARISH OF DEDDINGTON.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DEDDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WINDMILL CENTRE
HEMPTON ROAD
DEDDINGTON
BANBURY OXON
OX15 0QH
- Phone:
- 01869337447
- Website:
-
deddingtonparishcouncil.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window