WILLIAM PENNOYER FOR THE POOR
Charity Number: 244530
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the poor of Pulham St Mary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Total income: £24
Total expenditure: £20
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Norfolk
Governance
Registration history:
- 02 December 1968: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- PULHAM ST MARY VILLAGE CHARITIES (Working name)
- WILLIAM PENNOYER (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19 | £29 | £2.01k | £1.68k | £24 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15 | £28 | £1.84k | £1.42k | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 06 February 2009 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 19 March 2008 | 48 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 25TH MAY 1670 (R.V.29 PT. 1 P.595)
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR OF THE PARISH ON SME SUNDAY AFTERNOON SOON AFTER CHRISTMAS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF PULHAM ST. MARY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window