WARD MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have 3 flats, providing housing to residents of Iver over the age of 50.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 29 October 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Henry Gooding | Chair | 31 October 2013 |
|
|||||
GERALD PAINE | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA FOX | Trustee | 24 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.72k | £18.65k | £18.61k | £18.40k | £18.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.72k | £6.46k | £8.84k | £17.42k | £12.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2021 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1925 (UV 218 PAGE 283A), SCHEME OF THE 3RD JUNE 1970 AND 28TH JUNE 1984
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS OF EITHER SEX MARRIED OR SINGLE WHO HAVE EITHER BEEN BORN OR RESIDED IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF IVER FOR NOT LESS THAN 3 YEARS AT THE TIME OF ELECTION AND ARE NOT UNDER 50 YEARS OF AGE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF IVER AS CONSTITUTED ON 3 SEPTEMBER 1925.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
Delaford Close
Iver
Buckinghamshire
SL0 9JX
- Phone:
- 07943 612205
- Email:
- CLERKWARDMH@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window