CHICHESTER MEDICAL EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a Medical Centre for promoting and advancing by way of research lectures and discussions, the study and general knowledge of medicine and science and all matters relating to the progress and development of all branches of medicine, surgery, dentistry and veterinary medicine, for the benefit of mankind generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 September 1965: Standard registration
- CMEC (Working name)
- CHICHESTER POST GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Simeon Keates | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
NEIL HART | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Martindale | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Weller | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Honor Hinxman | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Hall | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bronwyn Middleton | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Carruthers Johnstone | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Witcomb | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA RIGBY | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neal Robert Gent | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hatef Mansoubi | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Guy Jonathan Charles Harris | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2001 |
|
|
||||
Dr GRAEME DEWHURST | Trustee | 19 March 1991 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.59k | £169.95k | £112.44k | £131.57k | £468.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.99k | £79.58k | £81.94k | £89.53k | £114.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 July 2024 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 July 2024 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH AUGUST 1965 AS AMENDED 19TH MARCH 1991.
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAING A MEDICAL CENTRE FOR PROMOTING AND ADVANCING BY WAY OF RESEARCH LECTURES AND DISCUSSIONS THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF MEDICINE AND SCIENCE AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL BRANCHES OF MEDICINE AND SURGERY FOR THE BENEFIT OF MANKIND GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chichester Medical Education Centre
St. Richards Hospital
Spitalfield Lane
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO19 6SE
- Phone:
- 01243788122
- Email:
- vanisha.m@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window