TOWNLAND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Owner of a field from which rents are received annually and used for funding support, primarily for elderly inhabitants of Colne Engaine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 07 October 1965: Standard registration
- 09 May 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 June 2013: Re-registered
- TOWN LAND CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Courtauld | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Terence Charles Floyd | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN GEORGE BARNARD | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
VIRGINIA ISMALIA JEGGO | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £711 | £379 | £754 | £677 | £383 | |
|
Total expenditure | £575 | £120 | £0 | £800 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 16 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 20 APRIL 1697 V REP VOL 32 PT I AT P 642
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE AGED POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COLNE ENGAINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 HIGH CROFT
COLNE ENGAINE
COLCHESTER
CO6 2HE
- Phone:
- 01787 223140
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window