DELOITTE'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses providing six units of accommodation for single people or couples for elderly people who live in the Southall area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Ealing
Governance
- 12 November 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esme Logan | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Barrow | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev MICHAEL FRANCIS BOLLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.72k | £23.12k | £21.95k | £31.09k | £23.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.72k | £36.88k | £25.40k | £28.77k | £18.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 30TH OCTOBER 1897 (U.V. 140 PAGE 308) AND SCHEMES OF THE 6TH JANUARY 1967 AND 2 JUNE 1970
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED PERSONS, MALE OR FEMALE, MARRIED OR SINGLE, UNABLE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BY THEIR OWN EXERTIONS PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE NOT BEING LESS THAN SIXTY YEARS OF AGE AND ALSO TO THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN RESIDENTS IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, SOUTHALL IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND NORWOOD IN THE PARISH OF HAYES FOR TWELVE MONTHS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY TRINITY VICARAGE
PARK VIEW ROAD
SOUTHALL
UB1 3HJ
- Phone:
- 02085717329
- Email:
- vicar.htsouthall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window