POOR FUND
Charity Number: 244664
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOCIAL WELLBEING OF YOUNG AND SENIOR RESIDENTS OF WHITTINGTON.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Total income: £18,073
Total expenditure: £20,165
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
One or more trustees receive payments and/or benefits from the charity for being a trustee
What, who, how, where
Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Staffordshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 14 September 1965: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 November 2012: Re-registered
- 15 September 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- WHITTINGTON POOL FUND (Working name)
- ALLOTMENT FOR FIELD GARDENS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.76k | £17.27k | £17.41k | £21.40k | £18.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.87k | £15.08k | £15.40k | £20.25k | £20.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 23 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 23 July 2015 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 23 July 2015 | 630 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 16TH OCTOBER 1961
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WHITTINGTON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ANCIENT PARISH OF WHITTINGTON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window