Accounts and annual returns THE JOICEY TRUST

Charity number: 244679
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 21 August 2024 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 08 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 September 2020 On Time