Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM SHEPHERD FOR POOR PENSIONERS OF THE WHEELWRIGHTS COMPANY
Charity number: 244695
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 15 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 23 March 2009 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 26 March 2009 | 512 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 14 November 2006 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window