Linked charities CHURCH PASTORAL-AID SOCIETY
Charity number: 244700
Removed charity
Linked charities
- A E ABBOTT
- ABRAHAM GILL ST THOMAS CROOKES SHEFFIELD CURATES
- ALBERT MITCHELL MEMORIAL
- AUGMENTATION FUND
- BATES
- BISHOP STRATTON SCHOLARSHIP
- BRIGHTON ST MARGARET FUND
- BRIGHTON ST MARGARET FUND
- CAMPS AND HOLIDAY FUND
- CHORLEYWOOD ST ANDREW CHURCH BUILDING FUND
- CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCRIPTURE READERS ASSOCIATION
- CLYDACH CURATES FUND
- COLONEL H M LEATHES
- COLONEL J J JONES
- COOPER FUND
- DAVENPORT EDUCATION FUND
- DELMAR CHARITABLE
- DERBY ST PETER FUND
- DISNEY ROBINSON NO 1 MEMORIAL FUND
- DISNEY ROBINSON NO 2 MEMORIAL FUND
- DISNEY ROBINSON NO 3 MEMORIAL FUND
- DISNEY ROBINSON NO 4 MEMORIAL FUND
- DISNEY ROBINSON NO 5 MEMORIAL FUND
- DOVER CHRIST CHURCH FUND
- DURHAM ST NICHOLAS FUND
- EASTBOURNE HOLY TRINITY ENDOWMENT FUND
- ELBURTON FUND
- EXETER ST LEONARD FUND
- F W FRENCH
- FROGMORE FUND
- G A BOOTH FUND
- GILL CAMPBELL MEMORIAL HALL
- GRAHAM
- GREAT BADDOW ADVOWSON
- GREENWOOD
- HENSINGHAM ST JOHN FUND
- HEYWOOD CHURCH REPAIR FUND
- HIGH WYCOMBE CHRIST CHURCH FUND
- INGLEBY
- J D KAY (ST PAUL BLACKLEY)
- J D KAY (ST PETER BLACKLEY)
- J D KAY MEMORIAL
- J F W DEACON FAMILY GRAVES AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 1993 BY NRESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992
- JARDINE LAY AGENTS
- JOHN DAY FUND
- JOHN PRITCHARD
- KESWICK
- LADIES HOME MISSION UNION BURSARY FUND
- LEIFCHILD
- LENTON HOLY TRINITY ENDOWMENT FUND
- LONDON CLERICAL EDUCATION AID FUND
- LUTHER
- MAIDSTONE ST FAITH ENDOWMENT FUND
- MAIDSTONE ST FAITH ENDOWMENT FUND
- MAIDSTONE ST FAITH, FUND
- MAIDSTONE ST LUKE FUND
- MARRIED MEN'S APPEAL FUND
- NOBLE
- NORMANTON-BY-DERBY ST GILES FUND
- NOTTINGHAM ST STEPHEN HYSON GREEN CHURCHWARDENS, FUND
- NOTTINGHAM ST STEPHEN HYSON GREEN ENDOWMENT FUND
- NOTTINGHAM ST STEPHEN HYSON GREEN FABRIC FUND
- ORDINATION CANDIDATES TRAINING (PONSBOURNE)
- ORDINATION FUND
- PATRONAGE FUND
- PENGE CHRIST CHURCH FUND
- PONSBOURNE CHURCH FUND
- ROBERTS
- ROGER LYON JONES
- ROSEBANK
- S G BROWN, FUND
- S M FANE
- SAVORY ENDOWMENT FOR ST PETER PALGRAVE
- SCARBOROUGH HOLY TRINITY FUND
- SECRETARIES PENSION FUND
- SELLWOOD
- SHEFFIELD ST JAMES FUND
- SHEFFIELD ST THOMAS CROOKES FABRIC FUND
- SIDNEY MYOTT
- SISSINGHURST TRINITY CHURCH FUND
- SLOUGH ST PAUL 2ND CURACY ENDOWMENT
- SLOUGH ST PAUL CHRISTCHURCH HALL
- SMITH BRAMCOTE
- SOUTHBOROUGH ST MATTHEW FUND
- ST KEVERNE FUND
- THETFORD ST PETER CHURCHWARDENS
- THETFORD ST PETER FABRIC FUND
- THORNTON
- TREVETHIN FUND
- WATTS DITCHFIELD TRUST
Governing document
COMMITTEE MINUTE 18TH OCTOBER 1956 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUNE 1993 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHURCH OR CHURCHES IN NOTTINGHAM AS THE SOCIETY SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 27 September 1965 : Standard registration
- 05 October 1993 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.