Accounts and annual returns HARRIET RUCK-KEENE TRUST

Charity number: 244710
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 06 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 21 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2014 24 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2013 28 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2013 Not Required