JACOBSEN FOUNDATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 1965: Standard registration
- 23 February 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 OCTOBER 1934 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 8 MARCH 1950, 17 NOVEMBER 1954, 22 NOVEMBER 1956, 29 JUNE 1965 AND 21 MAY 1991.
Charitable objects
PROVISION FOR POOR OR AGED OR SICK OR NEEDY PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN OR CONNECTED WITH THE TRADES OR BUSINESSES OF PAPER-MAKING, PRINTING, LITHOGRAPHY, TYPOGRAPHY AND BOOKBINDING OR OF MANUFACTURING OR DEALING IN SUCH ARTICLES AS ARE GENERALLY MANUFACTURED OR DEALT IN BY WHOLESALE AND MANUFACTURING STATIONERS OR ANY ALLIED TRADE OR BUSINESS AND IN MAKING SUCH PROVISION TO GIVE PARTICULAR CONSIDERATION TO THE POOR OR AGED OR SICK NEEDY EMPLOYEES OR EX-EMPLOYEES FOR THE TIME BEING OF NEWTON MILL LTD OR OF ANY OTHER COMPANY WHICH SHALL ACQUIRE THE BUSINESS OF THE SAID COMPANY OR BE AMALGAMATED THEREWITH WHETHER SUCH EMPLOYEES OR EX-EMPLOYEES ARE OR THE NEEDY DEPENDANTS OR RELATIONS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window