HALE CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To secure the preservaton, conservation, development and improvement of features of general public amenity or historic or architectural or public interest in the area of Hale, Hale Barns and Ashley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Trafford
Governance
- 06 April 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Johan Aldridge | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||
Denise Laver | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.83k | £1.72k | £1.41k | £34.81k | £6.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.86k | £1.57k | £1.55k | £27.20k | £9.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2024 | 685 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 294 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 March 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 APRIL 1965 AS AMENDED 18 JANUARY 1967 AND 14 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
A - TO PROTECT, PRESERVE AND STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA COMPRISING HALE AND INCLUDING HALE BARNS IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF TRAFFORD AND ASHLEY AND SUCH OTHER NEIGHBOURING AREAS AS THE SOCIETY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, WHICH AREA IS HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT B - TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF TOWN PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT C - TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
HALE AND INCLUDING HALE BARNS IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF TRAFFORD AND ASHLEY AND SUCH OTHER NEIGHBOURING AREAS AS THE SOCIETY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 APPLETON ROAD
HALE
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 9LP
- Phone:
- 07966449497
- Email:
- halecivicsociety@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window