THE ROYAL NAVAL FILM CORPORATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 01 October 1965: Standard registration
- 02 March 2001: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 March 2001: Funds transferred to 1082461 ROYAL NAVAL FILM LIBRARY
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29/9/1939 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19/1/1954, 17/7/1959 AND 31/3/1964
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF PERSONS SERVING IN ANY OF H.M. NAVAL FORCES (THAT IS TO THE ROYAL NAVY, THE ROYAL MARINES, AND NAVAL OR ROYAL MARINE RESERVE, THE WOMENS' ROYAL NAVAL SERVICE AND QUEEN ALEXANDRA'S ROYAL NAVAL NURSING SERVICE).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.