CLAVERDON AND DISTRICT NURSING FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial assistance for the sick and needy within the villages of Claverdon, Langley and Norton Lindsey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Warwickshire
Governance
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Joanne Catherine Parker | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Rogers | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joy Kathleen Cater | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Susan Cleverley | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Holding | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jon Stobart | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Henson | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN KEEFE | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/08/2020 | 28/08/2021 | 28/08/2022 | 28/08/2023 | 28/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £669 | £917 | £945 | £965 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £266 | £300 | £976 | £1.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 August 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 11 DECEMBER 1953
Charitable objects
INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF CLAVERDON, LANGLEY AND NORTON LINDSEY.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF CLAVERDON, LANGLEY AND NORTON LINDSEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORN COTTAGE
MANOR FARM
LANGLEY
STRATFORD UPON AVON
CV37 0HN
- Phone:
- 01926843812
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window