CONSTABLES CLOSE CHARITY

Charity number: 244892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help residents of Swayfield in times of need and ill health and support to St Nicholas Church, Swayfield in accordance with the Terms of the Trust.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £961
Total expenditure: £443

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Mary Green Chair 15 August 2023
None on record
Richard Alan Green Trustee 15 August 2023
None on record
John Nigel Stanley Trustee 15 August 2023
None on record
Alan Nigel Cusdin Trustee 15 August 2023
DIAMOND CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev Stephen Leslie Buckman Trustee 15 August 2023
CHURCH STREET ROOMS
Received: On time
Stephen Paul Hickling Trustee 15 August 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £880 £880 £877 £864 £961
Total expenditure £440 £440 £880 £440 £443
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 December 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 December 2023 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 November 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 CORBY ROAD
SWAYFIELD
GRANTHAM
NG33 4LQ
Phone:
07842160913
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available