THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ILKESTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Foster interest in the Ilkeston Community Hospital, support the work of the hospital by means of voluntary services, raising funds, receiving donations etc and ensure monies received are spent wisely.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 November 1965: Standard registration
- 15 April 2019: Funds received from 1002188 THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HEANOR HOSPITAL
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ILKESTON COMMUNITY HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ILKESTON HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Norman Marchment | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Marie Farmer | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Sharon Barker | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Schmidt | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Howe | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Speake | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judy Barratt | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Custance | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Barker | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Lathbury | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £439.26k | £24.49k | £83.65k | £40.51k | £159.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.41k | £88.76k | £18.24k | £88.57k | £109.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 1961 AND AMENDED 20 MARCH 1974 AND 21 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE HOSPITALS BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLUASE 3 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
ILKESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
106 Mason Road
ILKESTON
DE7 9LP
- Phone:
- 07967123426
- Email:
- lisa.george9@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window