Linked charities CHARITIES FOR POOR FREEMEN OF THE STATIONERS AND NEWSPAPER MAKERS COMPANY
Charity number: 244916
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1931 AND SCHEME OF 5 JULY 1967
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF FREEMEN OF THE STATIONERS' AND NEWSPAPER MAKERS' COMPANY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
PRIOR TO SCHEME OF 5/7/1967 REGISTERED UNDER 232034
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 03 December 1963 : Standard registration
- 03 October 1997 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.