THE MIDLANDS EVENTIDE HOME TRUST

Charity number: 244949
Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is run by Christians and exists to support the provision of accommodation and/or funds to support residential accommodation for the elderly

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £7,989
Total expenditure: £4,860

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Herefordshire
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Warwickshire
  • Wolverhampton
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH JAYNE LESLIE Trustee
None on record
COLIN GUILFORD CRABTREE Trustee
None on record
DONALD GEORGE HERBERT Trustee
None on record
DAVID ALAN ROBERTSON Trustee
None on record
HAZEL GRACE CRABTREE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.71k £11.89k £12.11k £11.39k £7.99k
Total expenditure £3.29k £3.69k £3.27k £4.48k £4.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 WHITEFIELDS GATE
SOLIHULL
B91 3GE
Phone:
01217057561
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available