NEECH LOAN FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LENDING SMALL SUMS TO BUSINESSES WITHIN A CATCHMENT AREA OF 10 MILES RADIUS OF NORTH WALSHAM, WITHIN THE TERMS OF THE TRUST DEED. ALSO PROVIDING SMALL GRANTS (NORMALLY ONLY ONE A YEAR) TO LOCAL ORGANISATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 November 1965: Standard registration
- 22 May 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 May 2023: Funds transferred to 803661 CLAN TRUST LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.59k | £6.03k | £6.17k | £5.04k | £5.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114 | £3.87k | £3.21k | £0 | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HIGH COURT SCHEME OF 31 JULY 1940 AND SCHEME OF 10 FEBRUARY 1978 AS AMENDED BY TRUSTEES RESOLUTION OF 12 MARCH 1997.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF LOANS TO PERSONS WHO ARE ABOUT TO COMMENCE BUSINESS OR ARE OWNERS OF SMALL BUSINESSES,PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE ENGAGED IN EITHER AGRICULTURE,HORTICULTURE OR DAIRYING.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window