Financial history CORNFORTH HOMES TRUST

Charity number: 244981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.81k £11.64k £11.52k £11.80k £13.88k
Total expenditure £9.95k £23.63k £11.88k £11.25k £12.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A