Accounts and annual returns SOPHIA LLOYD (INCLUDING THE AUGMENTATION OF THOMAS EDWARD LLOYD)

Charity number: 244994
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 25 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 25 March 2006 07 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 25 March 2005 10 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 25 March 2004 15 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2004 Not Required