Financial history THE BATCHWORTH TRUST

Charity number: 245061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £484.68k £8.35m £587.58k £736.00k £630.89k
Total expenditure £1.19m £770.63k £1.45m £1.59m £1.53m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £7.96m £100.00k £23.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £386.75k £487.58k £713.00k £630.89k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £7.96m £100.00k £23.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £709.80k £1.38m £1.51m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £60.83k £65.36k £83.56k £84.77k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £27.30k £27.54k £27.59k £30.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £682.50k £1.36m £1.48m £1.41m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £60.83k £65.36k £83.56k £84.77k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0