Wannock Village Hall

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages Wannock Village hall for hire to the general public. It is responsible for the maintenance & evolution of the hall to keep up with legislative standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 04 January 1966: Standard registration
- WANNOCK VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- WANNOCK MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Douglas Malcom Murray | Chair | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Frances Pritchett | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Nigel Meyer | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Frazer Ritchie | Trustee | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Clarke | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jan Meyer | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Erik John Morley | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.63k | £22.48k | £23.45k | £16.29k | £20.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.30k | £8.43k | £13.77k | £24.75k | £22.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.25k | £20.71k | £14.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 16TH JULY 1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 JAN 2008 as amended on 08 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE PARISHES OF JEVINGTON AND WILLINGDON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF JEVINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Old Mill Lane
POLEGATE
BN26 5NS
- Phone:
- 07922153321
- Email:
- wannockvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
wannockvillagehall.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window