THE LIZARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lizard Charity manages The Lizard Pastures as a piece of informal, natural countryside for the general benefit and enjoyment of the people of Wymondham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 October 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Fulcher | Chair | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Demmen-Sewell | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Butler | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Burrows | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Page | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette James | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Worthington-Hill | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeannie Harris | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Knights | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Durrant | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.79k | £10.79k | £4.81k | £9.45k | £8.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.05k | £2.84k | £5.30k | £28.42k | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22ND JANUARY 1954. as amended on 09 Mar 2022 as amended on 09 Mar 2022 as amended on 09 Mar 2022 as amended on 09 Mar 2022 as amended on 09 Mar 2022 as amended on 02 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
1 LAND TO BE USED FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WYMONDHAM AS A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND OR OTHERWISE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2 INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR ANY PUBLIC PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WYMONDHAM, AND FOR WHICH PROVISION CANNOT BE MADE OUT OF RATES TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WYMONDHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57a The Lizard
Wymondham
NR18 9BH
- Phone:
- 07771585010
- Email:
- janicedore76@gmail.com
- Website:
-
theclerk@thelizardwymondham.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window