THE 4TH DIVISION TRUST

Charity number: 245291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Nil

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,843
Total expenditure: £48,066

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 1966: Standard registration
  • 23 December 2011: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 23 December 2011: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALDERSHOT COMMAND TRUST (Previous name)
  • THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Whiting Chair 07 October 2024
None on record
ALISTA PETERS Trustee 02 September 2024
None on record
Aaron Benson Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Matthew Palmer Trustee 05 January 2024
None on record
David Kenny OBE Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Desmond Mhere Trustee 31 March 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.00k £8.61k £123.89k £3.90k £2.84k
Total expenditure £88.53k £23.13k £20.11k £75.26k £48.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 November 2021 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 November 2021 281 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF COMMISSIONERS DATED 4TH JANUARY 1993 AS VARIED BY SCHEME SEALED 4 DECEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
(1) THE MANAGING TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT CHARITIES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT FUND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THEY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE ARMY AND ARE FROM TIME TO TIME SERVING THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR MILITARY EFFICIENCY OR THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, OR IN RELIEVING CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS (2) THE MANAGING TRUSTEE OF THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT CHARITIES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT TRUST IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) IN MAKING GRANTS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED WITHIN SOUTHERN DISTRICT OR ELSEWHERE AS THEY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE ARMY AND ARE FROM TIME TO TIME SERVING IN SOUTHERN DISTRICT SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR MILITARY EFFICIENCY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 January 1966 : Standard registration
  • 23 December 2011 : Removed
  • 23 December 2011 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
C/O COMMANDING OFFICER
HQ Regional Command
Montgomery House
Queens Avenue
ALDERSHOT
GU11 2JN
Phone:
01252787612
Website:

No information available