Financial history BISHOP'S STORTFORD HOSPITALS LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity Number: 245316
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £5.64k £3.47k £3.76k £7.93k £3.92k
Total expenditure £2.79k £2.19k £630 £14.36k £2.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A