Financial history THE ARMY SPORT CONTROL BOARD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 245320
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £2.88m £2.99m £3.08m £3.12m £3.18m
Total expenditure £3.33m £2.47m £3.02m £3.01m £2.89m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.97m £2.99m £3.07m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £113.84k £128.46k £116.04k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.90m £2.87m £2.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £120.17k £132.99k £127.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0