BIRKBY VILLAGE GREEN

Charity Number: 245369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parish Council providing village green for village use.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Courtier Trustee 08 February 2016
CROSBY VILLAGE GREEN
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £1 £1 £1 £2
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 March 2024 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CANNONDALE HOUSE
6 The Nook
Crosby
MARYPORT
CA15 6SP
Phone:
07748752478