THE DEOPHAM CHARITY OF THE REVEREND HENRY RIX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of elderly persons, advancement of religious education, and the general benefit of inhabitants of the area in such charitable ways as the trustees think fit whilst resident within the ecclesiastical parish of Deopham, Norfolk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 November 1965: Standard registration
- DEOPHAM RIX CHARITY (Working name)
- THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF THE REVEREND HENRY RIX (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glenys Ruby Brown | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Flowerday | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|||||
JACQUELINE ANN PHOENIX | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Angela Joan Phoenix | Trustee | 14 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40k | £740 | £4.24k | £720 | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.85k | £320 | £320 | £2.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PR VOL 29 PT 1 PAGE 629, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 3 DECEMBER 1897, RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993, AND RESOLUTION MADE 17 JANUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
A. THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS: AND B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND: C. THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF THE AREA IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEOPHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walnut Tree Farm
Stalland Lane
Deopham
WYMONDHAM
Norfolk
NR18 9DN
- Phone:
- 07826 498212
- Email:
- phoenix627@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window