CITY OF CHELMSFORD MENCAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
City of Chelmsford Mencap provides life long learning, social and respite services for people with learning disability or additional needs, as well as their families and carers. We operate in Chelmsford, Essex and provide services information and support to people across mid-Essex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 15 December 1965: Standard registration
- CHELMSFORD MENCAP (Working name)
- CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- CHELMSFORD MENCAP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony North | Chair | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Sharon Symon | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Ruth Thompson | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Chris Newson | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Rachel Scott | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Abigail Krone | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Philip Preston | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Stoppard | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Powell | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.15k | £168.93k | £158.16k | £138.72k | £157.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £196.38k | £162.72k | £129.81k | £133.19k | £154.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £480 | £17.75k | £134.67k | £45.85k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/11/1979 AS AMENDED ON 04/09/2002 AS AMENDED ON 28/12/2012
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASONS OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. "LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
City Of Chelmsford Mencap
56 Mildmay Road
CHELMSFORD
CM2 0DZ
- Phone:
- 01245 268303
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window