Accounts and annual returns DINGLEYS CHARITY FOR THE POOR OF UNITED METHODIST FREE CHURCH

Charity number: 245628
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 17 August 2011 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2009 07 December 2010 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required