THE ROLLESBY MAPES AND AMIS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity rents out their land and with the rent we distribute cash or coal to Rollesby parishioners who have lived in village for 10 years and are aged 75 or over.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 03 December 1965: Standard registration
- POOR'S ALLOTMENT (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Dudley Hawksley Tacon | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE CATHERINE GALLANT | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
glenda laureen tooke | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY RUDRUM | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN VINCENT DAY | Trustee | 10 November 2004 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANNE TACON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/03/2020 | 22/03/2021 | 22/03/2022 | 22/03/2023 | 22/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59k | £3.41k | £2.52k | £2.52k | £3.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.96k | £3.12k | £2.63k | £2.69k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD DATED 7TH MARCH 1816 (PR VOL.26 PAGE 272) AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FUEL FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF ROLLESBY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROLLESBY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GRANGE
FLEGGBURGH ROAD
ROLLESBY
GREAT YARMOUTH
NR29 5AJ
- Phone:
- 01493730236
- Email:
- thetacons@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window