Trustees THE ROLLESBY MAPES AND AMIS CHARITY
Charity number: 245703

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Dudley Hawksley Tacon | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE CATHERINE GALLANT | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
glenda laureen tooke | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY RUDRUM | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN VINCENT DAY | Trustee | 10 November 2004 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANNE TACON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.