HORTON CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief in need charity for individual person who live in the parish of Horton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 06 April 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Patrick Solomon Samuels | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Herbert Michael Blackman | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ann Baxter | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew McKeon | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
CAROLYN BOISTON WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £420 | £320 | £436 | £736 | £503 | |
|
Total expenditure | £840 | £0 | £260 | £487 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6 APRIL 1981.
Charitable objects
THE UPKEEP OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORTON AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES THEREIN.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Coppermill Road
Wraysbury
Staines-upon-Thames
TW19 5NU
- Phone:
- 01753682918
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window