Financial history The Brotherhood Community Hall

Charity Number: 245784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £29.73k £33.12k £27.17k £29.14k £33.76k
Total expenditure £19.46k £21.13k £33.02k £35.71k £30.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.37k N/A N/A N/A