Financial history FRIENDS OF THE BELLS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, KERSEY

Charity number: 245874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/03/2020 26/03/2021 26/03/2022 26/03/2023 26/03/2024
Total gross income £66 £4 £74 £440 £534
Total expenditure £25 £140 £200 £120 £128
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A