THE SHROPSHIRE UNION CANAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enhancement of the Shropshire Union and Llangollen Canals; restoration of the Montgomery Canal
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Powys
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 January 1966: Standard registration
- S U C S (Working name)
- SUCS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Ball | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GRAHAM CLEWS | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Hesketh | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Fulda | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Feeney | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Alexander Robertson | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pat Tolster | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN FRANCIS HENDLEY | Trustee | 16 November 2002 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.04k | £67.38k | £98.01k | £126.63k | £115.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.52k | £62.20k | £73.09k | £84.33k | £73.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/09/1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2010 as amended on 11 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE, EITHER ALONE OR JOINTLY OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY OTHER PERSON CORPORATION BOARD OR PUBLIC OR LOCAL AUTHORITY AND WITH AND SUBJECT TO ALL SUCH STATUTORY PROVISIONS, STATUTORY INSTRUMENTS OR OTHER PROVISIONS OR REQUIREMENTS OF THE LAW, AND ALL SUCH PERMISSIONS AND CONSENTS AS MAY BE REQUIRED BY LAWS FOR THE CARRYING OUT OF THE OBJECTS AS A CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE NAVIGATION THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE TOWING PATHS AND THE AMENITIES OF THE SHROPSHIRE UNION CANAL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE UNION CANAL AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Morris Cook
Bryn Estyn
East Street
LLANGOLLEN
Clwyd
LL20 8RB
- Phone:
- 01630656525
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window