Financial history THE WILTON MEMORIAL ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 245928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.39k £18.01k £14.96k £13.47k £18.86k
Total expenditure £13.93k £13.28k £16.87k £13.43k £12.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A N/A N/A N/A