HEADQUARTERS LAND COMMAND COMMANDER IN CHIEF'S FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 04 February 1966: Standard registration
- 07 February 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- C I N C 'S FUND (Working name)
- HEADQUARTERS SOUTHERN COMMAND (Previous name)
- UNITED KINGDOM LAND FORCES COMMANDER IN CHIEF'S FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
(CHARTER DATED 22ND FEBRUARY 1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 3RD JULY 1984. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 18 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(A) GENERAL WELFARE AND AMENITIES FOR OFFICERS AND OTHER RANKS, ESPECIALLY AT HEADQUARTERS UNITED KINGDOM LAND FORCES. (B) PURCHASE OF WREATHS, OFFICIAL CHRISTMAS CARDS, NON-ALCOHOLIC REFRESHMENTS AT CONFERENCES AND SIMILAR REQUIREMENTS. (C) PAYMENT OF SUBSCRIPTIONS TO APPROVED CHARITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.