THE WORCESTERSHIRE BEE KEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training and learning about beekeeping
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 December 1965: Standard registration
- THE WORCESTER BEE KEEPERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Cracknell | Chair | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Vivian | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Toft | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jones | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Edmunds | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH BEDDOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUSTUS KLAAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.55k | £18.62k | £23.29k | £31.15k | £27.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.63k | £17.35k | £22.41k | £31.35k | £25.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE RULES OF THE ASSOCIATION
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEE-KEEPING.
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Watery Lane
MALVERN
Worcestershire
WR14 4JX
- Phone:
- 01684576968
- Email:
- maggiebees12@gmail.com
- Website:
-
wbka.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window