Accounts and annual returns PRESTON ON WYE AND BLAKEMERE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 245987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 August 2023 15 August 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 20 August 2022 25 August 2023 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 20 August 2021 25 August 2023 431 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 August 2020 23 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 August 2019 23 February 2021 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2019 Not Required