Financial history HALES AND HECKINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 246013
Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016
Total gross income £2.23k £2.96k £2.80k £2.47k £2.05k
Total expenditure £2.50k £1.02k £1.59k £1.22k £6.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A