Financial history GRAND FEOFFMENT CHARITIES

Charity number: 246018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £94.19k £98.15k £117.71k £125.80k £133.51k
Total expenditure £81.79k £72.63k £98.53k £118.42k £111.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.31k £3.08k