Trustees APPLEDORE HALL
Charity number: 246022

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Powell | Chair | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Whittle | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terence Bailey | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Carter | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hawkins | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Waters | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher White | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Julia Lange | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Eastman | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER OWEN REVELEY ACIS FCBSI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.