CHARITY OF ROBERT GRANTHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poor men
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 31 December 1965: Standard registration
- 24 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 05 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 17 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 7TH JUNE 1616, P.R. 32P.4 P.654.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF FOUR POOR BEADSMEN (OR BEGGARS) (OR ALMSMEN) FROM DUNHOLM, FOUR FROM SCOTHERN AND TWO FROM SUDBROOKE. BENEFITS TO BE DISTRIBUTED ON ALL SOULS AND ASCENSION FEAST DAYS 10/- TO BE PAID TO THE VICAR FOR THE DELIVERY OF A SERMON ON THE SAME FEAST DAYS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF DUNHOLME,SCOTHERN,SUDBROOKE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window